OWENS et al v. STIFEL NICOLAUS & COMPANY INC

Plaintiff: MARTHA F OWENS, SUSAN ROCKETT, DONALD ABNER POPE, JR and REFUSE MATERIALS INC
Defendant: STIFEL NICOLAUS AND COMPANY INC
 
Case Number: 7:2012cv00144
Filed: October 30, 2012
 
Court: Georgia Middle District Court
Office: Valdosta Office
County: Irwin
Presiding Judge: Hugh Lawson
 
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 18, 2014 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 62 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 66 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Ordered by U.S. District Judge HUGH LAWSON on 6/18/2014. (nbp)
September 9, 2014 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 103 Motion to Substitute. Ordered by U.S. District Judge HUGH LAWSON on 9/9/2014. (nbp)
May 15, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 19 Motion to Stay. Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on 5/15/2013. (nbp)
September 19, 2013 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 31 Motion for Discovery; granting 34 Motion for Leave to File with instructions; lifting stay of 5/15/2013. Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on 9/19/2013. (nbp)
November 18, 2013 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER memorializing phone conference and Court's rulings of 11/18/2013. Ordered by U.S. District Judge Hugh Lawson on 11/18/2013. (nbp)
December 6, 2013 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER following in camera review of documents. Stifel is ordered to produce certain documents to Plaintiffs' counsel no later than December 13, 2013. Ordered by U.S. District Judge Hugh Lawson on December 6, 2013. (mbh)
January 22, 2014 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 70 Motion for Default Judgment. Hearing presently scheduled for 1/28/2014 is cancelled. Ordered by U.S. District Judge HUGH LAWSON on 1/22/2014. (nbp)
March 11, 2014 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 50 Motion to Exclude Certain Testimony. Ordered by U.S. District Judge HUGH LAWSON on 3/11/2014. (nbp)
June 5, 2014 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 58 Motion for Summary Judgment. Ordered by U.S. District Judge HUGH LAWSON on 6/5/2014. (nbp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: OWENS et al v. STIFEL NICOLAUS & COMPANY INC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARTHA F OWENS
Represented By: Brent Jamieson Savage, Jr
Represented By: Brent J. Savage
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUSAN ROCKETT
Represented By: Brent Jamieson Savage, Jr
Represented By: Brent J. Savage
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONALD ABNER POPE, JR
Represented By: Brent Jamieson Savage, Jr
Represented By: Brent J. Savage
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REFUSE MATERIALS INC
Represented By: Brent Jamieson Savage, Jr
Represented By: Brent J. Savage
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STIFEL NICOLAUS AND COMPANY INC
Represented By: Ronald B. Gaither, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]