HURLEY v. GGNSC TIFTON LLC et al

Plaintiff: BOBBY LEE HURLEY, JR
Defendant: GGNSC TIFTON LLC and GGNSC EQUITY HOLDINGS LLC
 
Case Number: 7:2013cv00032
Filed: March 18, 2013
 
Court: Georgia Middle District Court
Office: Valdosta Office
County: Tift
Presiding Judge: Hugh Lawson
 
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Medical Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
December 24, 2013 23 Featured Case ORDER allocating settlement proceeds. Ordered by U.S. District Judge Hugh Lawson on December 24, 2013. (mbh)
January 2, 2014 24 Featured Case ORDER OF SETTLEMENT. Ordered by U.S. District Judge Hugh Lawson on January 2, 2014. (mbh)
April 8, 2013 9 Featured Case ORDER granting 8 Motion Granting Limited Discovery and extension. Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on 4/8/2013. (nbp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: HURLEY v. GGNSC TIFTON LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BOBBY LEE HURLEY, JR
Represented By: Eric K Milles
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GGNSC TIFTON LLC
Represented By: David Cavender Marshall
Represented By: Debra E. LeVorse
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GGNSC EQUITY HOLDINGS LLC
Represented By: David Cavender Marshall
Represented By: Debra E. LeVorse
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]