DANTZLER INC v. HUBERT MOORE LUMBER COMPANY INC et al

Defendant: JOAN MOORE DRAWDY, NORMA MOORE GASKINS, HUBERT MOORE LUMBER COMPANY INC, WILBUR STANLEY MOORE and DUPONT PINE PRODUCTS LLC
Plaintiff: DANTZLER INC
Counter_claimant: DUPONT PINE PRODUCTS LLC, WILBUR STANLEY MOORE, JOAN MOORE DRAWDY, NORMA MOORE GASKINS and HUBERT MOORE LUMBER COMPANY INC
Counter_defendant: DANTZLER INC
 
Case Number: 7:2013cv00056
Filed: April 26, 2013
 
Court: Georgia Middle District Court
Office: Valdosta Office
County: Berrien
Presiding Judge: Hugh Lawson
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 5, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 18 Motion for TRO. Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on 6/5/2013. (nbp)
August 21, 2013 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding as moot 28 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; finding as moot 29 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on 8/21/2013. (nbp)
September 24, 2013 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 37 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on 9/24/2013. (nbp)
September 25, 2013 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 38 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on 9/25/2013. (nbp)
October 17, 2013 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER staying case as to Defendant Hubert Moore Lumber Company, Inc.; remaining parties to report in writing to the Court not later than 10/25/2013. Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on 10/17/2013. (nbp)
October 31, 2013 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STAYING CASE. Defense counsel directed to file status report not later than 1/28/2014. Ordered by U.S. District Judge Hugh Lawson on 10/31/2013. (nbp)
July 21, 2014 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing defense counsel to file written report as to bankruptcy status not later than 7/28/2014. Ordered by U.S. District Judge HUGH LAWSON on 7/21/2014. (nbp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: DANTZLER INC v. HUBERT MOORE LUMBER COMPANY INC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOAN MOORE DRAWDY
Represented By: Mark A. Gilbert
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORMA MOORE GASKINS
Represented By: Mark A. Gilbert
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HUBERT MOORE LUMBER COMPANY INC
Represented By: HEATHER LYNN KELLY
Represented By: DAVID E MULLIS
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILBUR STANLEY MOORE
Represented By: Mark A. Gilbert
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DUPONT PINE PRODUCTS LLC
Represented By: Daniel Laverne Studstill
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANTZLER INC
Represented By: Michael S. Meyer Von Bremen
Represented By: BRANDON J HECHTMAN
Represented By: JORDAN S COHEN
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: DUPONT PINE PRODUCTS LLC
Represented By: Daniel Laverne Studstill
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: WILBUR STANLEY MOORE
Represented By: Mark A. Gilbert
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: JOAN MOORE DRAWDY
Represented By: Mark A. Gilbert
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: NORMA MOORE GASKINS
Represented By: Mark A. Gilbert
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: HUBERT MOORE LUMBER COMPANY INC
Represented By: HEATHER LYNN KELLY
Represented By: DAVID E MULLIS
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: DANTZLER INC
Represented By: JORDAN S COHEN
Represented By: BRANDON J HECHTMAN
Represented By: Michael S. Meyer Von Bremen
Represented By: JORDAN S COHEN
Represented By: BRANDON J HECHTMAN
Represented By: Michael S. Meyer Von Bremen
Represented By: JORDAN S COHEN
Represented By: BRANDON J HECHTMAN
Represented By: Michael S. Meyer Von Bremen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]