Muchnicki v. Windsor Management Services, Inc. et al

Defendant: Munich Reinsurance America, Inc. and Windsor Management Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Michael Muchnicki
Case Number: 1:2013cv01304
Filed: April 19, 2013
Court: Georgia Northern District Court
County: Fulton
Presiding Judge: Thomas W. Thrash
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 2, 2014 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 88 Second Report and Recommendation of Special Master. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 5/2/14. (dr)
May 2, 2014 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 95 Report and Recommendation of Special Master, denying Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 5/2/14. (dr)
May 2, 2014 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 96 Report and Recommendation of Special Master regarding the location of the Defendant's Rule 30(b)(6) deposition. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 5/2/14. (dr)
May 8, 2014 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving & adopting 99 Report and Recommendation of Special Master regarding discovery issues involving interrogatories 7 & 8 and documents requests 56-68. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 5/8/2014. (ss)
February 26, 2014 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 81 Report and Recommendation of Special Master, granting in part and denying in part 60 Motion to Compel and for Sanctions. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 2/26/14. (dr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Muchnicki v. Windsor Management Services, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Munich Reinsurance America, Inc.
Represented By: Robert H. Bernstein
Represented By: Jason H. Kislin
Represented By: Michael J. Slocum
Represented By: Natasha Wilson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Windsor Management Services, Inc.
Represented By: Robert H. Bernstein
Represented By: Jason H. Kislin
Represented By: Michael J. Slocum
Represented By: Natasha Wilson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Muchnicki
Represented By: Richard Lance Robbins
Represented By: Rachel Frazier Gage
Represented By: Jason S. Alloy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]