Killer Joe Nevada, LLC v. Does 1-81

Plaintiff: Killer Joe Nevada, LLC
Defendant: Doe 1
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv01450
Filed: April 30, 2013
 
Court: Georgia Northern District Court
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Julie E. Carnes
 
Nature of Suit: Copyright

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 28, 2013 4 Featured Case ORDER AND OPINION vacating the Court's 3 May 8, 2013 Order. John Does 2-81 are severed and the actions against them are dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff is directed to designate any actions filed against these severed defendants as re lated to this action, if they allege claims like those in the complaint filed here. With respect to John Doe 1, the only defendant now remaining in this action, the plaintiffs motion 2 is granted. Signed by Judge Julie E. Carnes on 5/28/13. (ddm)
June 19, 2013 5 Featured Case ORDER AND OPINION directing the plaintiff to immediately contact the ISPs to rescind and withdraw previously-issued subpoena for each such defendant. Any information that plaintiff may have obtained through these previously-issued subpoenas must be r eturned. Plaintiff shall ensure that this information is communicated to each ISP by June 25, 2013 and shall report back to the Court by July 1, 2013, providing copies of these letters to each ISP, as well as a report as to its compliance with this Order. Signed by Judge Julie E. Carnes on 6/18/13. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Attachment 2, # 3 Attachment 3, # 4 Attachment 4)(ddm)
July 16, 2013 8 Featured Case ORDER AND OPINION granting 7 Defendant's Motion to quash the subpoena and motion to proceed by pseudonym. Signed by Judge Julie E. Carnes on 7/16/13. (ddm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Killer Joe Nevada, LLC v. Does 1-81
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Killer Joe Nevada, LLC
Represented By: Alan Kan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe 1
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]