Henderson v. Apple, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: Michael Henderson
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv02794
Filed: August 21, 2013
 
Court: Georgia Northern District Court
Office: Atlanta Office
County: Paulding
Presiding Judge: Richard W. Story
 
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 16, 2013 16 MAILED A.O. 121 Form to the Register of Copyrights. (cem)
December 16, 2013 Clerks Certificate of Mailing as to Apple, Inc. re 15 Clerks Entry of Dismissal. (cem)
December 16, 2013 Civil Case Terminated. (cem)
December 16, 2013 15 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING 14 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with prejudice pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(i). (cem)
December 16, 2013 Notification of Docket Correction re 13 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudce Defendant Apple, Inc.. Incorrect event used to efile pleading. Entry to be re-docketed using the correct event of Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (cem)
December 13, 2013 14 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice pursuant to FRCP 41.a.1.i by Michael Henderson. (cem)
December 13, 2013 13 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice Defendant Apple, Inc. by Michael Henderson. (Wallace, Kelly) Modified on 12/16/2013: Incorrect event used to efile pleading. Entry to be re-docketed as a Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (cem)
November 15, 2013 Clerks Certificate of Mailing as to Apple, Inc. re 12 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. (cem)
November 14, 2013 12 Featured Case ORDER granting 11 Final Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Apple, Inc. shall file its answer or other responsive pleading to 1 Complaint on or before 12/15/2013. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 11/14/2013. (cem)
November 13, 2013 11 Final MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by Michael Henderson. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Wallace, Kelly)
November 1, 2013 10 Featured Case ORDER granting 9 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Apple, Inc. shall file its answer or other responsive pleading on or before 11/15/2013 to Plaintiff's 1 Complaint. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 11/1/2013. (cem)
November 1, 2013 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by Michael Henderson. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Wallace, Kelly)
October 25, 2013 8 Court Notice Of Filing: Standing Order by Judge Richard W. Story. (rag)
September 27, 2013 7 Featured Case ORDER granting 6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Apple, Inc. shall file their responsive pleading on or before 11/1/2013. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 9/27/2013. (anc)
September 25, 2013 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by Michael Henderson. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Wallace, Kelly)
September 16, 2013 5 Featured Case ORDER granting 4 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant to file its answer or other responsive pleading on or before 10/2/2013, to the 1 Complaint. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 9/13/2013. (cem)
September 13, 2013 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by Michael Henderson. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wallace, Kelly)
August 21, 2013 3 MAILED A.O. 121 Form to the Register of Copyrights. (cem)
August 21, 2013 Submission of 1 Complaint for Preliminary Injunctive Relief, submitted to District Judge Richard W. Story. (cem)
August 21, 2013 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Apple, Inc. (cem)
August 21, 2013 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Michael Henderson. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113E-4746401.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Copyright Record, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(cem) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Henderson v. Apple, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Henderson
Represented By: Jamie Ponder Woodard
Represented By: Kelly O. Wallace
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]