Davila v. Marshall et al

Plaintiff: Anthony Davila
Defendant: Logan Marshall and FNU Durden
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00149
Filed: October 3, 2012
 
Court: Georgia Southern District Court
Office: Augusta Office
County: McDuffie
Referring Judge: W. Leon Barfield
Presiding Judge: J. Randal Hall
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
January 23, 2013 11 Featured Case ORDER that a copy of Plaintiff's Complaint and a copy of this Order shall be served upon Defendants Marshal and Durden by the United States Marshal. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Graham on 1/23/2013. (csr)
February 12, 2013 15 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 12 Report and Recommendations, that Plaintiff's Objections are overruled; and that Plaintiff's claims Defendants Marshall and Durden in their official capacities are DISMISSED. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 2/12/13. (jah)
April 23, 2013 26 Featured Case ORDER directing Plaintiff to file any objections to Defendants' 25 MOTION to Dismiss, or to otherwise inform the court of his decision not to object to the Defendants' motion within twenty-one days of the date of this Order. The Clerk is instructed to attach a copy of Rule 41, FED. R. CIV. P., as well as Rule 12, FED. R. CIV.P., to the copy of this Order that is served on the Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Graham on 4/23/2013. (csr)
September 4, 2013 48 Featured Case ORDER Denying Plaintiff's request for certification. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Graham on 9/4/2013. (csr)
October 17, 2013 52 Featured Case ORDER adopting Magistrate Judge's 49 Report and Recommendations; granting in part and denying in part Defendants' 25 Motion to Dismiss; that Plaintiff's RLUIPA claims for monetary damages are dismissed; that Plaintiff's 42 U.S.C. § 1983 claims for compensatory damages are also dismissed; and that all other claims remain pending. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 10/17/13. (jah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Davila v. Marshall et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Davila
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Logan Marshall
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Durden
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]