Wilson v. Bussey et al

Plaintiff: Gene Renard Wilson
Defendant: Terri Bussey, Sgt. Codey, Lt. Caler, Officer Tommy and Lt. Jones
Case Number: 1:2013cv00054
Filed: April 5, 2013
Court: Georgia Southern District Court
Office: Augusta Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: W. Leon Barfield
Presiding Judge: J. Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 12, 2014 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 21 Report and Recommendation and overruling objections. Plaintiffs claims based on (1) deliberate indifference to safety in violation of the Eighth Amendment against Defendants Bussey, Caler, and Codey, (2) violation of prison regulations against all defendants, and (3) supervisory liability against Defendant Bussey are dismissed. Defendants Bussey, Caler, and Codey are dismissed this case. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 05/12/2014. (thb)
August 14, 2014 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 36 Report and Recommendation; dismissing Plaintiff's claim against Defendant Tommy without prejudice for failure to timely effect service; and dismissing Defendant Tommy from this case. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 08/14/2014. (thb)
January 8, 2015 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 27 Motion to Dismiss, adopting 45 Report and Recommendations, dismissing this civil action, and closing this civil action. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 01/08/2015. (thb)
April 13, 2015 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Petitioner's leave to appeal in forma pauperis re 59 AFFIDAVIT in Support 56 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis re 58 F.R.A.P. construed as a Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 04/13/2015. (thb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Bussey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gene Renard Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terri Bussey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Codey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Caler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Tommy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.