Sackman v. Balfour Beatty Communities, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Lauren Sackman
Defendant: Balfour Beatty Communities, LLC, John Doe, Jane Doe, Richard Roe Corporation and Mary Doe Corporation
Case Number: 1:2013cv00066
Filed: May 1, 2013
Court: Georgia Southern District Court
Office: Augusta Office
County: Richmond
Referring Judge: W. Leon Barfield
Presiding Judge: J. Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 8, 2014 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 16 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 18 Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiff's Expert Mark E. Williams; granting in part and denying in part 20 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. This case shall proceed to trial in due course. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 09/08/2014. (thb)
September 26, 2014 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER and Notice of Pretrial Proceedings. Evidentiary objections and motions in limine due by 1/29/2015. All responses due by 2/8/2015. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/29/2014. Jury Trial set for 2/23/2015, 09:00 AM before Judge J. Randal Hall. Pretrial Conference set for 2/18/2015, 11:00 AM before Judge J. Randal Hall. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 09/26/2014. (thb)
February 17, 2015 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendants' request for a continuance. The pre-trial conference, jury trial, and deadlines set forth in this Court's September 26, 2014 Order and Notice of Pretrial Proceedings are continued until further notice. The Court directs the parties to file a status report in the event the agreement is not finalized before that date. Status Report due by 3/20/2015. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 02/17/2015. (thb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sackman v. Balfour Beatty Communities, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren Sackman
Represented By: C. Caleb Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Balfour Beatty Communities, LLC
Represented By: James W. Allen
Represented By: J. Arthur Davison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Roe Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Doe Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]