HOLMES v. DALRYMPLE et al

Plaintiff: MORRIS SCOTT HOLMES
Defendant: DALRYMPLE, Caleb Ajibade and Jose Morales
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv00099
Filed: October 22, 2012
 
Court: Georgia Southern District Court
Office: Dublin Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: W. Leon Barfield
Presiding Judge: Dudley H. Bowen
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
February 7, 2013 20 Featured Case ORDER adopting 17 Report and Recommendations. Therefore, plaintiff's claim related to the disapperance of his property, as well as his claim related to the "No Talking" policy in the prison dining hall, are Dismissed for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 2/7/13. (cmr)
May 30, 2013 42 Featured Case ORDER denying as moot 30 32 26 ; adopting 37 Report and Recommendations; granting 25 Motion to Dismiss, therefore claims against defendant Morales are dismissed without prejudice and he is dismissed from this case. Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 5/30/13. (cmr)
October 23, 2013 67 Featured Case ORDER adopting 63 Report and Recommendations. Therefore, granting in part and denying in part 47 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's official capacity claims for money damages against Defendants are dismissed, but Defendants' motion to d ismiss Plaintiff's amended complaint in its entirety is denied. This case shall proceed on the other claims. Once defendants' answer is filed, the Clerk shall issue a scheduling notice setting deadlines. Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 10/23/13. (cmr)
June 3, 2014 99 Featured Case ORDER denying as moot 86 89 90 91 92 ; adopting 87 Report and Recommendations. Granting 93 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response 87 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS and will consider his original and amended objections. This case is dismissed and closed. Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 6/3/14. (cmr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: HOLMES v. DALRYMPLE et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MORRIS SCOTT HOLMES
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DALRYMPLE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caleb Ajibade
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Morales
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]