Holcomb et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al

Plaintiff: Marla Gould Holcomb and Henry C. Holcomb
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
 
Case Number: 4:2012cv00111
Filed: April 24, 2012
 
Court: Georgia Southern District Court
Office: Savannah Office
County: Chatham
Referring Judge: G. R. Smith
Presiding Judge: William T. Moore
 
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 22, 2012 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 26 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery; granting 26 Motion to Stay; granting 26 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 10/22/2012. (loh)
January 11, 2013 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 32 Motion for Hearing; granting 33 Motion to Compel; granting 36 Motion for Protective Order; denying 38 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 28 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 1/11/13. (bcw)
February 4, 2013 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 42 Motion for Reconsideration; granting 48 Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 2/4/13. (bcw)
March 26, 2013 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that the Court ameds its prior scheduling order to grant the parties' joint request that discovery be extended through March 31, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 3/26/2013. (loh)
June 10, 2013 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 60 Motion for postponement; deferring ruling on 71 Motion to Compel; deferring ruling on 75 Motion to Appoint Expert. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 6/10/13. (bcw)
September 20, 2013 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing as moot 51 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; dismissing as moot 71 Motion to Compel; dismissing as moot 75 Motion to Appoint Expert; dismissing as moot 77 Motion to Dismiss; granting 78 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 9/20/2013. (loh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Holcomb et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marla Gould Holcomb
Represented By: Stanley Earl Harris, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry C. Holcomb
Represented By: Stanley Earl Harris, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Dylan W. Howard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]