Roberts v. Wells Fargo Bank, NA et al

Plaintiff: Lucy Roberts
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, NA, Wells Fargo Insurance Inc., American Securities Insurance Company and Assurant, Inc.
 
Case Number: 4:2012cv00200
Filed: July 24, 2012
 
Court: Georgia Southern District Court
Office: Savannah Office
County: Chatham
Presiding Judge: B. Avant Edenfield
Referring Judge: G. R. Smith
 
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
August 9, 2012 13 Featured Case ORDER granting 11 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice ; granting 12 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 8/9/2012. (loh)
August 20, 2012 22 Featured Case ORDER granting 20 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice; granting 21 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 8/20/2012. (loh)
August 21, 2012 27 Featured Case ORDER granting 24 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 8/21/2012. (loh)
September 27, 2012 33 Featured Case ORDER granting 30 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice; granting 31 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 9/27/2012. (loh)
January 22, 2013 60 Featured Case ORDER granting 45 Motion to Stay discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 1/22/2013. (loh)
March 27, 2013 61 Featured Case ORDER granting 36 Motion to Dismiss. The Clerk is Ordered to transmit the record to the Supreme Court of Georgia. This case is stayed pending the Supreme Court's decision on the certified question. Signed by Judge B. Avant Edenfield on 3/27/13. (bcw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Roberts v. Wells Fargo Bank, NA et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucy Roberts
Represented By: Lynn A. Toops
Represented By: Richard E. Shevitz
Represented By: Frederick S. Bergen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, NA
Represented By: Robert R. Ambler, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Insurance Inc.
Represented By: Robert R. Ambler, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Securities Insurance Company
Represented By: Frank G. Burt
Represented By: Landon K. Clayman
Represented By: Michael S. French
Represented By: Julie C. Jared
Represented By: Farrokh Jhabvala
Represented By: Joseph W. Ozmer, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assurant, Inc.
Represented By: Frank G. Burt
Represented By: Landon K. Clayman
Represented By: Michael S. French
Represented By: Julie C. Jared
Represented By: Farrokh Jhabvala
Represented By: Joseph W. Ozmer, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]