Sullivan's Administrative Managers II, LLC v. Guarantee Insurance Company et al

Defendant: Patriot National Insurance Group, Inc., Guarantee Insurance Company and Ullico Casualty Company
Counter_claimant: Guarantee Insurance Company, Patriot National Insurance Group, Inc. and Ullico Casualty Company
Counter_defendant: Sullivan's Administrative Managers II, LLC
Plaintiff: Sullivan's Administrative Managers II, LLC
 
Case Number: 4:2012cv00212
Filed: August 15, 2012
 
Court: Georgia Southern District Court
Office: Savannah Office
County: Chatham
Presiding Judge: B. Avant Edenfield
Referring Judge: G. R. Smith
 
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 15, 2012 2 Opinion or Order of the Court GENERAL ORDER: Report of Rule 26(f) planning meeting. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 8/15/2012. (loh)
April 25, 2013 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 67 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 4/25/2013. (loh)
August 23, 2013 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's 30 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting Defendant Patriot's 43 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying Defendant Guarantee's 48 and 51 Motions for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Lisa G. Wood on 8/23/2013. (ca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Sullivan's Administrative Managers II, LLC v. Guarantee Insurance Company et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patriot National Insurance Group, Inc.
Represented By: Mary O. Morris
Represented By: John V. Burch
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guarantee Insurance Company
Represented By: Mary O. Morris
Represented By: John V. Burch
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ullico Casualty Company
Represented By: Mary O. Morris
Represented By: John V. Burch
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Guarantee Insurance Company
Represented By: John V. Burch
Represented By: Mary O. Morris
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Patriot National Insurance Group, Inc.
Represented By: John V. Burch
Represented By: Mary O. Morris
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Ullico Casualty Company
Represented By: John V. Burch
Represented By: Mary O. Morris
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Sullivan's Administrative Managers II, LLC
Represented By: Brent J. Savage
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sullivan's Administrative Managers II, LLC
Represented By: Brent J. Savage
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]