T. V. D. B. Sarl et al v. KAPLA USA, LP et al

Plaintiff: T. V. D. B. Sarl, Kapla France SARL and Tom's Toys, LLC
Defendant: KAPLA USA, LP, KAPLA USA GP, LLC, CITIBLOCS, LLC and Marjorie I. Chayette
Case Number: 4:2012cv00230
Filed: September 6, 2012
Court: Georgia Southern District Court
Office: Savannah Office
County: Chatham
Presiding Judge: B. Avant Edenfield
Referring Judge: G. R. Smith
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 13, 2012 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 15 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice; granting 16 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 12/13/2012. (loh)
May 7, 2013 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 24 Motion to amend the Scheduling Order; denying 25 Motion to Compel; granting the request to take Jurisdictional Discovery; dismissing 25 Motion to Continue; granting in part and denying in part 23 Motion to enlarge the number of interrogatories. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 5/7/13. (bcw)
September 11, 2013 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 33 Motion to Compel; denying 33 Motion to Dismiss; denying 33 Motion for Sanctions; denying 33 Motion to Expedite; denying 41 Motion Confirmation of Designation ; denying 42 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 9/11/13. (bcw)
December 5, 2013 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 64 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 12/5/2013. (loh)
December 16, 2013 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 49 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 50 Motion for Summary Judgment. The parties are ORDERED to submit briefs on the proper conversion rate from Euros to Dollars within twenty one days of this Order. Signed by Judge B. Avant Edenfield on 12/16/2013. (loh)
January 9, 2014 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that the Court awards a total of $150,848.68 to T.V.D.B. SARL, and Kapla France SARL and directs the Clerk to enter judgment accordingly against KAPLA USA, LP, KAPLA USA GP, LLC and Citiblocs, LLC. The joint proposed pretrial order is due 1/24/14. Signed by Judge B. Avant Edenfield on 1/9/14. (wwp)
March 26, 2014 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that the parties are to submit a voluntary dismissal pursuant to Rule 41 or a joint proposed pretrial order by 5:00 PM on March 31, 2014. Signed by Judge B. Avant Edenfield on 3/25/2014. (loh)
April 1, 2014 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING re 89 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Kapla France SARL, T. V. D. B. Sarl, Tom's Toys, LLC. This case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge B. Avant Edenfield on 4/1/2014. (loh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: T. V. D. B. Sarl et al v. KAPLA USA, LP et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T. V. D. B. Sarl
Represented By: Ashley A. Kutz
Represented By: Robert R. Ambler, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kapla France SARL
Represented By: Robert R. Ambler, Jr.
Represented By: Ashley A. Kutz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tom's Toys, LLC
Represented By: Robert R. Ambler, Jr.
Represented By: Ashley A. Kutz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAPLA USA, LP
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAPLA USA GP, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITIBLOCS, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marjorie I. Chayette
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]