Murdock v. United States of America

Petitioner: Hezekiah Murdock
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 4:2012cv00251
Filed: October 9, 2012
Court: Georgia Southern District Court
Office: Savannah Office
County: Chatham
Presiding Judge: B. Avant Edenfield
Referring Judge: G. R. Smith
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255 Motion to Vacate Sentence
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 25, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS denying re 1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Hezekiah. Objections to R&R due by 7/8/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 6/24/2013. (loh)
June 25, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing all parties to be served re 13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Hezekiah Murdock. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 6/24/2013. (loh)
July 16, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING re 13 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge B. Avant Edenfield on 7/15/2013. (loh)
January 22, 2015 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that upon receipt of the 11th Circuit mandate for the 18 Notice of Appeal filed by Hezekiah Murdock, the Deputy Clerk shall appoint new counsel and schedule a hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 1/22/15. (wwp)
October 10, 2012 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that the Court directs respondent to file an answer or response within thirty days from the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 10/10/2012. (loh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murdock v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Hezekiah Murdock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: James D. Durham
Represented By: R. Brian Tanner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.