Visalus, Inc. v. Then et al

Plaintiff: Visalus, Inc.
Defendant: Ocean Avenue LLC and Amber Then
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv00028
Filed: January 30, 2013
 
Court: Georgia Southern District Court
Office: Savannah Office
County: Chatham
Referring Judge: G. R. Smith
Presiding Judge: William T. Moore
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity of citizenship
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
February 25, 2013 10 Featured Case ORDER granting 9 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 2/25/2013. (loh)
March 6, 2013 13 Featured Case ORDER granting 11 Motion to transfer venue. The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida, Jacksonville Division. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 3/6/13. (wwp)
February 1, 2013 5 Featured Case ORDERED that Plaintiff is directed to file, within 30 days from the date of this Order, an amended complaint. 1 Complaint filed by Visalus, Inc. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 2/1/13. (wwp)
February 20, 2013 8 Featured Case ORDER denying 3 Motion for TRO; deferring ruling on 3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; dismissing as moot 4 Motion for Hearing. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 2/20/2013. (loh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Visalus, Inc. v. Then et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Visalus, Inc.
Represented By: Peter R. Bulmer
Represented By: Eric R. Magnus
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocean Avenue LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey S. York
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amber Then
Represented By: Jeffrey S. York
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]