Johnson v. Astrue

Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Plaintiff: Gwendolyn E.H. Johnson
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv00031
Filed: February 7, 2013
 
Court: Georgia Southern District Court
Office: Savannah Office
County: Chatham
Referring Judge: G. R. Smith
Presiding Judge: William T. Moore
 
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 16, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that within thirty days from the entry of this Order, plaintiff shall serve and file a brief setting forth all erors which plaintiff contends entitle the plaintiff to relief. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 5/16/2013. (loh)
March 28, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING re 20 Report and Recommendations as the Court's opinion in this case, Plaintiff's appeal is denied. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 3/28/2014. (loh)
March 28, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered dismissing this case. (loh)
February 13, 2013 3 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS directing the Clerk to forward a copy of Johnson's complaint and this Order to the Marshal for service upon Michael J. Astrue re 1 Complaint. Objections to R&R due by 2/27/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 2/13/2013. (loh)
February 13, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing all parties to be served re 3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 2/13/2013. (loh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Johnson v. Astrue
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Represented By: Melissa Stebbins Mundell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gwendolyn E.H. Johnson
Represented By: Randall A. Schmidt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]