Green v. St. Lawerence et al

Defendant: Enoch, Al St. Lawerence, Welsh and Middleton
Plaintiff: Antha Green
Case Number: 4:2013cv00068
Filed: March 21, 2013
Court: Georgia Southern District Court
Office: Savannah Office
County: Chatham
Presiding Judge: B. Avant Edenfield
Referring Judge: G. R. Smith
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 27, 2013 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that plaintiff must return both the Prisoner Trust Account Statement and the Consent to Collection of Fess from Trust Account to the Clerk within thirty days of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 3/27/2013. (loh)
September 11, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS dismissing re 1 Complaint filed by Antha Green. Objections to R&R due by 9/25/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 9/11/2013. (loh)
September 11, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing all parties to be served re 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Antha Green. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 9/11/2013. (loh)
October 28, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING the 6 Report and Recommendations dismissing the case. Signed by Judge B. Avant Edenfield on 10/28/13. (wwp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green v. St. Lawerence et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enoch
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Al St. Lawerence
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Welsh
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Middleton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antha Green
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]