Benjamin v. SNF Holding Company

Defendant: SNF Holding Company
Plaintiff: Barto P. Benjamin
Case Number: 4:2013cv00088
Filed: April 11, 2013
Court: Georgia Southern District Court
Office: Savannah Office
County: Liberty
Presiding Judge: B. Avant Edenfield
Referring Judge: G. R. Smith
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Age)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 3, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the parties to prepare and sign a consolidated Rule 26(f) report within 7 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 6/3/13. (wwp)
July 23, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS granting re 7 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Chemtall Inc. re 1 Complaint filed by Barto P. Benjamin. Objections to R&R due by 8/5/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 7/22/2013. (loh)
July 23, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing all parties to be served re 25 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 7 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Chemtall Inc. re 1 Complaint filed by Barto P. Benjamin. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 7/22/2013. (loh)
July 23, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 21 Motion to add the Fair Labor Standards Act. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 7/22/2013. (loh)
August 16, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS denying the 21 MOTION TO AMEND Complaint and Granting the 7 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by SNF Holding Company. Signed by Judge B. Avant Edenfield on 8/16/13. (wwp)
June 30, 2014 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING the 48 Report and Recommendations granting the 39 Motion for summary judgment and denying the cross 43 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Barto P. Benjamin. The case is dismissed. Signed by Judge B. Avant Edenfield on 6/30/14. (wwp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benjamin v. SNF Holding Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SNF Holding Company
Represented By: Sara Kaur Sahni
Represented By: Frederick L. Warren
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barto P. Benjamin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]