Hamlin v. Colvin

Plaintiff: Robert Hamlin
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv00100
Filed: April 19, 2013
 
Court: Georgia Southern District Court
Office: Savannah Office
County: Chatham
Referring Judge: G. R. Smith
Presiding Judge: William T. Moore
 
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 16, 2014 15 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS Reversing the Commissioner's Decision and Remanding this case for further consideration re 1 Complaint filed by Robert Hamlin. Objections to R&R due by 5/30/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 5/16/2014. (loh)
May 16, 2014 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing all parties to be served re 15 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Robert Hamlin. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 5/16/2014. (loh)
June 23, 2014 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 15 Report and Recommendations reversing the Commissioner's decision and remanding the case under sentence four for further consideration. The Clerk of Court is directed the close the case. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 6/20/14. (wwp)
August 20, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that within thirty days from the entry of this Order, plaintiff shall serve and file a brief setting forth all errors which plaintiff contends entitile the plaintiff to relief. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 8/19/2013. (loh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Hamlin v. Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Hamlin
Represented By: Charles L. Martin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]