Burley v. Berry

Plaintiff: James Burley
Defendant: R. Berry
Case Number: 5:2012cv00105
Filed: October 1, 2012
Court: Georgia Southern District Court
Office: Waycross Office
County: Ware
Referring Judge: James E. Graham
Presiding Judge: Lisa G. Wood
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 2, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 9 Report and Recommendations. Plaintiff's claims for monetary damages against Officer R. Berry in his official capacity are dismissed. Signed by Chief Judge Lisa G. Wood on 1/2/2013. (ca)
July 2, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff to file any objections to the Defendant's 17 MOTION to Dismiss; or to otherwise inform the court of his decision not to object to Defendant's motion within twenty-one days from the date of this Order. The Clerk is instructed to attach a copy of Rule 41, FED. R. CIV. P., as well as Rule 12, FED. R. CIV. P., to the copy of this Order that is served on the Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Graham on 7/2/2013. (csr)
September 6, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING the Magistrate Judge's 21 Report and Recommendations, and GRANTING 17 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. The Clerk of Court is hereby authorized and directed to enter an appropriate Judgment of Dismissal. Signed by Chief Judge Lisa G. Wood on 9/5/2013. (csr)
November 26, 2012 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing United States Marshal Service of Complaint and a copy of this Order; generally, a defendant who timely returns the waiver is not required to answer the complaint until sixty days after the date that the marshal sent the request for waiver. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Graham on 11/26/2012. (csr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burley v. Berry
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Burley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Berry
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]