Patel v. Owens et al

Plaintiff: Subodhchandra T. Patel
Defendant: Brian Owens, Bruce Chatman and Janet Brewton
 
Case Number: 6:2012cv00105
Filed: November 19, 2012
 
Court: Georgia Southern District Court
Office: Statesboro Office
County: Bulloch
Referring Judge: James E. Graham
Presiding Judge: B. Avant Edenfield
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
January 22, 2013 2 Featured Case ORDER that a copy of Plaintiff's Complaint and a copy of this Order shall be served upon Defendant Brewton by the U.S. Marshal. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Graham on 1/22/2013. (csr)
September 4, 2013 43 Featured Case ORDER dismissing as moot 29 Motion to Return the matter to the Magistrate Judge and granting 34 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend his Amended Complaint. Plaintiff's 30 Objections are dismissed as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Graham on 9/4/2013. (csr)
December 11, 2013 60 Featured Case ORDER adopting re 44 Report and Recommendations; granting 55 Motion to Amend/Correct and referring the amended complaint to the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge B. Avant Edenfield on 12/11/13. (bcw)
July 15, 2014 65 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING IN PART THE SECOND 61 Report and Recommendations as to Plaintiff's equal protection claims, which are dismissed. The due process claims against Defendant, as far as they allege Defendant deprived him of meaningful access to legal resources, legal documents, and the courts, survive frivolity. Signed by Judge B. Avant Edenfield on 7/15/14. (wwp) Modified on 7/15/2014 (wwp).
March 11, 2013 8 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING the 3 Report and Recommendations dismissing claims against defendants Owens and Chatman. Plaintiff's retaliation claim against Brewton remains pending. Signed by Judge B. Avant Edenfield on 3/11/13. (wwp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Patel v. Owens et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Subodhchandra T. Patel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Owens
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Chatman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Brewton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]