Green v. Hooks et al

Plaintiff: Darius Ishun Green
Defendant: John Brown, Grubbs and Brad Hooks
 
Case Number: 6:2013cv00017
Filed: February 19, 2013
 
Court: Georgia Southern District Court
Office: Statesboro Office
County: Bulloch
Referring Judge: James E. Graham
Presiding Judge: B. Avant Edenfield
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
April 15, 2013 16 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING re 8 Report and Recommendations. Plaintiff's claims against Defendants in their official capacities are dismissed. Signed by Judge B. Avant Edenfield on 4/15/2013. (loh)
May 31, 2013 22 Featured Case ORDER directing Plaintiff to file any objections to 20 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, or to otherwise inform the court of his decision not to object to Defendants' motion within twenty-one days of the date of this Order. Clerk is instructed to attach a copy of Rule 41, FED. R. CIV. P., as well as Rule 12, FED. R. CIV. P., to the copy of this Order that is served on the Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Graham on 5/31/2013. (csr)
August 29, 2013 36 Featured Case ORDER adopting re 33 Report and Recommendations; denying 20 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge B. Avant Edenfield on 8/29/13. (bcw)
March 14, 2013 7 Featured Case ORDER that a copy of Plaintiff's Complaint and a copy of this Order shall be served upon Defendants Hooks, Brown, and Grubbs by the United States Marshal. Generally, a defendant who timely returns the waiver is not required to answer the complaint until sixty days after the date that the marshal sent the request for waiver. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Graham on 3/14/2013. (csr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Green v. Hooks et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darius Ishun Green
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Brown
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grubbs
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Hooks
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]