Brown v. United States of America

Respondent: United States of America
Petitioner: William B. Brown
 
Case Number: 6:2013cv00038
Filed: April 10, 2013
 
Court: Georgia Southern District Court
Office: Statesboro Office
County: Bulloch
Presiding Judge: B. Avant Edenfield
Referring Judge: G. R. Smith
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255 Motion to Vacate Sentence
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 1, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING re 8 Report and Recommendations; denying 4 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge B. Avant Edenfield on 8/1/2013. (loh) Modified on 8/1/2013 (loh).
September 18, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying the request for COA and also denies as moot any motion to proceed IFP. Signed by Judge B. Avant Edenfield on 9/18/13. (bcw)
July 23, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS denying re 1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) filed by William B. Brown, denying 4 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by William B. Brown. Petitioner's in forma pauperis status on appeal should like wise be denied. Objections to R&R due by 8/6/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 7/22/2013. (loh)
July 23, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing all parties to be served re 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) filed by William B. Brown. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 7/22/2013. (loh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Brown v. United States of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Nancy Colleen Greenwood
Represented By: R. Brian Tanner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: William B. Brown
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]