Toor v. Moralas et al

Respondent: Attorney General and Jose Moralas
Petitioner: Gurpartap Singh Toor
Defendant: Debrae C. Kennedy
Case Number: 6:2013cv00051
Filed: April 29, 2013
Court: Georgia Southern District Court
Office: Statesboro Office
County: Bulloch
Presiding Judge: B. Avant Edenfield
Referring Judge: G. R. Smith
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Federal)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 8, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Gurpartap Singh Toor. This case should be dismissed. Objections to R&R due by 7/22/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 7/8/13. (bcw)
July 8, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 12 Motion to file articles ; denying 13 Motion to file civil rights complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 7/8/13. (bcw)
July 25, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING the 16 Report and Recommendations dismissing the case. The Plaintiff's motion to reopen case CV613-48 is granted. Signed by Judge B. Avant Edenfield on 7/25/13. (wwp)
May 30, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS dismissing re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Gurpartap Singh Toor. Objections to R&R due by 6/12/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 5/29/2013. (loh)
May 30, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing all parties to be served re 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Gurpartap Singh Toor. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 5/29/2013. (loh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Toor v. Moralas et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jose Moralas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gurpartap Singh Toor
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debrae C. Kennedy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]