Maeda Pacific Corporation v. GMP Hawaii, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Maeda Pacific Corporation
Defendant: GMP Hawaii, Inc., Ohio Pacific Tech, Inc., GMP Associates, Inc. and Jorgensen and Close Associates, Inc.
 
Case Number: 1:2008cv00012
Filed: August 14, 2008
 
Court: Guam District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Guam
Presiding Judge: Frances M. Tydingco-Gatewood
 
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 23, 2010 167 Opinion or Order of the Court Opinion and Order Re: Motion for Approval of Good-Faith Settlement. The Court hereby GRANTS the Smithbridge motion but DENIES the J&CA motion, insofar as they seek approval of any purported good-faith settlement of claims. The court will resolve th e remaining parts of the J&CA motion forthwith. (related document(s): 69 Alternative Motion for Summary Judgment, or Approval of Good Faith Settlement, for the Dismissal of the Third Party Complaint filed by Smithbridge Guam, Inc., 80 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by U.S. Speciality Insurance Company, Jorgensen and Close Associates, Inc.) Signed by Chief Judge Frances M. Tydingco-Gatewood on 2/23/2010. (fad, )
August 2, 2011 269 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting 225 Motion to Stay Proceedings on Direct Action Claim Pending Contractual Arbitration; finding as moot 263 Request for TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE; finding as moot 267 Request for TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE. In light of the imposed stay, t he court hereby VACATES the scheduling conference set for 08/03/2011. Lexington shall file a report with the court on 11/01/2011 and every three (3) months thereafter, advising it of the status of the arbitration proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joaquin V.E. Manibusan, Jr on 8/2/2011. (fad, )
September 23, 2011 288 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting 208 Motion for Approval of Good-Faith Settlement. Signed by Chief Judge Frances M. Tydingco-Gatewood on 9/23/2011. (fad, )
February 27, 2012 307 Opinion or Order of the Court Order GRANTING 301 Joinder; DENYING 300 Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment and Motion for Entry of Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Frances M. Tydingco-Gatewood on 2/27/2012. (fad, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Maeda Pacific Corporation v. GMP Hawaii, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maeda Pacific Corporation
Represented By: Samuel S. Teker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GMP Hawaii, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio Pacific Tech, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GMP Associates, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jorgensen and Close Associates, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]