Adkins v. Limtiaco et al

Plaintiff: James L. Adkins
Defendant: Alicia G. Limtiaco, Paul Suba, D.B. Anciano, Serafino Artui, Does I Through X, Office of the Attorney General of Guam and Guam Police Department
 
Case Number: 1:2009cv00029
Filed: December 3, 2009
 
Court: Guam District Court
Office: Hagatna Office
County: Guam
Presiding Judge: Frances M. Tydingco-Gatewood
 
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 22, 2011 163 Opinion or Order of the Court Opinion and Order granting in part and denying in part 116 Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by D.B. Anciano, Serafino Artui. The court hereby grants the motion as to Counts I, II and IX and dismisses those counts WITHOUT leave to amend. The court hereby denies the motion as to Counts III, IV, V, VI, VII and VIII. Plaintiff shall file his Third Amended Complaint by October 24, 2011, if at all. Signed by Chief Judge Frances M. Tydingco-Gatewood on 9/22/2011. (fad)
September 22, 2011 164 Opinion or Order of the Court Opinion and Order granting in part and denying in part 115 Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by Paul Suba. The court hereby grants the Motion as to Counts I, II and IX and dismisses those counts WITHOUT leave to amend. The court als o hereby grants the Motion as to Count III, but dismisses that count WITH leave to amend. Finally, the court hereby denies the Motion as to Counts IV and VIII, except that the reference to "Theft of Property" in Count VIII is hereby STRICKEN. Plaintiff shall file his Third Amended Complaint by October 24, 2011, if at all. Signed by Chief Judge Frances M. Tydingco-Gatewood on 9/22/2011. (fad, )
March 8, 2010 54 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting 31 Motion to Stay Discovery and Rule 16 Scheduling Order Timelines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joaquin V.E. Manibusan, Jr. on 3/8/2010. (fad, )
August 24, 2010 78 Opinion or Order of the Court Order adopting in part and rejecting the Magistrate Judge's 63 Report and Recommendations; overrules in part and sustains in part the Defendants' 68 69 Objections to Report and Recommendations; finding as moot 65 Motion for Extension of Time to File; finding as moot 27 Motion to Dismiss. (related document(s): 28 Motion to Dismiss, 29 Motion to Dismiss; 30 Motion to Dismiss). Signed by Chief Judge Frances M. Tydingco-Gatewood on 8/24/2010. (fad, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Adkins v. Limtiaco et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James L. Adkins
Represented By: Anita Perez Arriola
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alicia G. Limtiaco
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Suba
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.B. Anciano
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Serafino Artui
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does I Through X
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of the Attorney General of Guam
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guam Police Department
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]