Guerrero v. Astrue

Plaintiff: Luisa S. Guerrero
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
 
Case Number: 1:2007cv00612
Filed: December 19, 2007
 
Court: Hawaii District Court
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Honolulu
Presiding Judge: HELEN GILLMOR
Referring Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
 
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:416 Denial of Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 13, 2009 23 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION TO GRANT PLAINTIFF'S 18 MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION. Objections to F&R due by 3/2/2009. Signed by Magistrate JUDGE LESLIE E KOBAYASHI on February 13, 2009. (bbb, )
March 10, 2009 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING THE 23 MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION, AS MODIFIED, TO GRANT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION, VACATING THE ADMINISTRATIVE LAW JUDGES DECISION AND REMANDING THE CASE FOR FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Chief JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR on March 9, 2009. (bbb, )
February 25, 2010 39 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT OF SPECIAL MASTER ON 33 PETITION FOR ATTORNEY FEE PURSUANT TO § 206(B)(1): "In accordance with the foregoing, this Court, acting as Special Master, FINDS AND RECOMMENDS that Mark Debofsky's Petition for Attorney Fee Pursuan t to § 206(b)(1), filed on January 4, 2010, should be GRANTED. The Court RECOMMENDS that the district judge: 1) award Petitioner $18,389.00 in attorney's fees; and 2) order Petitioner to reimburse Plaintiff $6,260.00for the stipul ated EAJA fees. IT IS SO FOUND AND RECOMMENDED.". Signed by Magistrate JUDGE LESLIE E KOBAYASHI on February 25, 2010. (bbb, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notification s received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on 02/26/2010. Proposed Order Adopting sent via email to gillmor_orders@hid.uscourts.gov on the date of this order.
March 22, 2010 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 39 REPORT OF SPECIAL MASTER ON PETITION FOR ATTORNEY FEE PURSUANT TO § 206(B)(1). Signed by Senior JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR on March 22, 2010. (bbb, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Guerrero v. Astrue
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luisa S. Guerrero
Represented By: Carl M. Varady
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]