Herron v. Astrue

Plaintiff: James Y. Herron
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 1:2007cv00623
Filed: December 27, 2007
Court: Hawaii District Court
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Honolulu
Presiding Judge: HELEN GILLMOR
Referring Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 19, 2009 31 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION TO DENY PLAINTIFF'S 15 MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION. Objections to F&R due by 3/5/2009. Signed by Magistrate JUDGE LESLIE E KOBAYASHI on February 19, 2009. (bbb, )
June 12, 2009 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 31 MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION, (DOC. 31), AS MODIFIED, TO DENY PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION. Signed by Chief JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR on June 12, 2009. (bbb, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/12/2009: # 1 Main Document) (bbb, ).
May 11, 2011 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REMANDING CASE TO THE COMMISSIONER OF THE SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION PURSUANT TO THE NINTH CIRCUIT COURT OF APPEAL'S ORDER DATED DECEMBER 22, 2010 1 , 48 . Signed by JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR on 5/11/2011. ~ This matter is hereby REMANDED to the Commissioner of Social Security to proceed as required by the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals Order filed December 22, 2010. (ecs, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on 5/12/2011
March 21, 2012 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING MAGISTRATES JUDGE'S FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 65 . Signed by JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR on 3/21/2012. (ecs, )No COS issued for this docket entry
May 31, 2012 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS TO THE FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES UNDER THE EQUAL ACCESS TO JUSTICE ACT (DOC. 66 ) AND ADOPTING THE MAGISTRATE JU DGE'S FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION TO DENY PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES UNDER THE EQUAL ACCESS TO JUSTICE ACT (DOC. 65 ). Signed by JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR on 5/31/2012. ~ Although the Ninth Circuit Court of A ppeals concluded that the ALJ's disability determination was not supported with substantial evidence, a review of the record indicates that the ALJs decision had a basis in law and fact. The ALJ's decision, and the Commissioners support the reof, was substantially justified. Pursuant to the EAJA, the Plaintiff is not entitled to attorneys' fees. (1) PLAINTIFFS OBJECTIONS TO THE FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONSOF THE U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR ATTOR NEYS' FEES UNDER THE EQUAL ACCESS TO JUSTICE ACT (Doc. 66), filed March 21, 2012, are DENIED. (2) The Magistrate Judge's FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION TO DENY PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES UNDER THE EQUAL ACCESS TO JUS TICE ACT (Doc. 65), filed February 29, 2012, are ADOPTED. (ecs, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
September 19, 2012 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION 88 .. Signed by JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR on 9/19/2012. (ecs, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Herron v. Astrue
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Y. Herron
Represented By: Carl M. Varady
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]