Brenner v. Indymac Bank, F.S.B. et al

Plaintiff: Steven L. Brenner
Defendant: Indymac Bank, F.S.B., One West Bank, FSB, John or Jane Does 1-100 and John Roes 1-100
 
Case Number: 1:2010cv00113
Filed: March 2, 2010
 
Court: Hawaii District Court
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Hawaii
Referring Judge: BARRY M. KURREN
Presiding Judge: SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY
 
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 15:1601 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
November 9, 2010 50 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 31 , 42 - - Signed by JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 11/9/10. ("...because Brenner is proceeding pro se in this action, this court delays entry of judgment. Unless by De cember 8, 2010, Brenner files a motion to file an amended complaint, judgment will be automatically entered." "Any such motion will be decided by the Magistrate Judge.") (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry. A copy of this order has been served by First Class Mail to Steven L. Brenner at the address of record on November 9, 2010.
November 30, 2010 60 Featured Case ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S RECONSIDERATION MOTION 54 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 11/30/10. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Steven L. Brenner shall be served by first class mail on December 1, 2010.
December 17, 2010 67 Featured Case ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS RECONSIDERATION MOTION OF COURTS ORDERGRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (ECF No. 50) 61 50 . Signed by JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 12/17/2010. ~ Brenner remains allowed to file a motion for leave to file an amended complaint by the extended deadline of December 28, 2010. Brenner states that the court is "unduly burdening" him "with [the] requirement to amend complaint... and such demands... amounts to another point of involunt ary servitude." Motion for Reconsideration 3, ECF No. 61. Brenner misunderstands the courts previous order. The court gave Brenner the option to file a motion for leave to file an amended complaint and stated that "Brenner is free to refrai n from filing such a motion." Order Den. Summ. J. 20, ECF No. 50. Unless by December 28, 2010, Brenner files a motion for leave to file an amended complaint, judgment will be automatically entered against him. (ecs, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants (Steven Brenner) not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry.
January 13, 2011 71 Featured Case ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S TO STAY (ECF NO. 70 ) & ORDER OF DISMISSAL - Signed by JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 1/13/11. ("The court dismisses this action, and the Clerk of Court is directed to close the file.") (emt, ) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Steven L. Brenner shall be served by first class mail at the address of record on January 14, 2011. Modified on 1/13/2011 (emt, ).
January 26, 2011 75 Featured Case ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S "MOTION/PETITION TO REVERSE OR WITHDRAW ORDER GRANTING SUMMARY JUDGMENT" (ECF NO. 74 ) - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 1/26/11. (All pending motions are denied as moot. Terminating: 73 MOTION/PETITION for Leave to File Amended Complaint.) (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Steven L. Brenner shall be served by first class mail at the address of record on January 27, 2011.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Brenner v. Indymac Bank, F.S.B. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven L. Brenner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indymac Bank, F.S.B.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One West Bank, FSB
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John or Jane Does 1-100
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Roes 1-100
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]