Jura v. County of Maui et al

Defendant: County of Maui, Benjamin M. Acob and Marie J. Kosgarten
Plaintiff: Jacki Jura
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv00338
Filed: May 25, 2011
 
Court: Hawaii District Court
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Maui
Presiding Judge: SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY
Referring Judge: RICHARD L. PUGLISI
 
Nature of Suit: Housing/Accommodations
Cause of Action: 28:1343
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 17, 2012 149 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 94 ; 96 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 10/17/12. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
December 10, 2012 169 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION re 163 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 12/10/12. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notif ications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
December 27, 2012 171 Featured Case ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION re 154 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 12/27/12. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
June 13, 2014 211 Featured Case ORDER REJECTING ADDITIONAL SANCTIONS ORDER re 189 , 197 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 6/13/2014. " Although the court excuses Jura's noncompliance with the sanction order at this time, the court recogn izes that Jura's inability to pay the sanction may change in the future. The court therefore requires Jura for three years from the date of this order or until the original sanction is paid, whichever occurs first, to inform the County of Mau i whenever she begins employment, including providing the County of Maui with the name and address of any employer and the title of her position. Additionally, if Jura becomes financially able to pay the sanction order, she should do so without hav ing to involve the court. In other words, if Jura becomes able to pay the sanction at some time in the future, she will lack the current excuse for her noncompliance and should comply with the terms of the order." (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Jura v. County of Maui et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Maui
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin M. Acob
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marie J. Kosgarten
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacki Jura
Represented By: William J. Deeley
Represented By: John Winnicki
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]