Spagnolo v. Social Security Administration

Defendant: Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Nick Spagnolo
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv00353
Filed: June 2, 2011
 
Court: Hawaii District Court
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Honolulu
Presiding Judge: DAVID ALAN EZRA
Referring Judge: RICHARD L. PUGLISI
 
Nature of Suit: Health Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:427
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 19, 2011 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) DENYING PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS TO THE FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION 9 AND (2) ADOPTING THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION 6 . Signed by JUDGE DAVID ALAN EZRA on 7/19/2011. (afc)CERTIFICAT E OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
September 21, 2011 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) ADOPTING IN PART AND MODIFYING IN PART THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION 28 AND (2) DENYING AS MOOT PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS. Signed by JUDGE DAVID ALAN EZRA on 9/21/2011. [Order denies as moot Motions: Motion for Writ of Mandamus, doc. no. 20 ; Motion for Summary Judgment 23 ; and Motion for Attorneys Fees, doc no. 32 . Plaintiff granted 30 days to amend his Complaint and refile his Application to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees] (afc)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Plaintiff Nick Spagnolo served with a copy of the instant order and the "Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs" form; service via first class mail on the date of this docket entry.
January 11, 2012 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) ADOPTING THE 48 MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION AND (2) DISMISSING THE ACTION. Signed by District JUDGE DAVID ALAN EZRA on January 11, 2012. (bbb, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
February 13, 2012 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION 53 . Signed by JUDGE DAVID ALAN EZRA on 2/13/2012. (afc)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Spagnolo v. Social Security Administration
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nick Spagnolo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]