Kaeo-Tomaselli v. Women's Community Correctional Center et al

Plaintiff: Dione Kaeo-Tomaselli
Defendant: Women's Community Correctional Center, Abby Medrano, Department of Public Safety, State of Hawaii, Tina Doe, Eric Doe and Health Care Unit
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv00669
Filed: November 1, 2011
 
Court: Hawaii District Court
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Honolulu
Presiding Judge: SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY
Referring Judge: RICHARD L. PUGLISI
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 7, 2012 22 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION TO DISMISS DEFENDANT ABBY MEDRANO IN HER OFFICIAL CAPACITY AND GIVING PLAINTIFF LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT 18 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 5/7/12. -- " The court gives Kaeo-Tomaselli leave to file a Second Amended Complaint no later than June 12, 2013. The court stresses that claims for money damages against state employees sued only in their official capacities may not be reasserted." " T he Clerk of Court is directed to send Kaeo-Tomaselli two more copies of the "Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint" form for her use." (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). A copy of this order, along with two copies of the court's "Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint" form and instructions were served to Dion'e Kaeo-Tomaselli at the address of record on May 7, 2012.
August 28, 2012 42 Featured Case ORDER DENYING REQUEST FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF re 38 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 8/28/12. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Dion'e Kaeo-Tomaselli were served by first class mail at the address of record on August 28, 2012.
March 19, 2013 58 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re 47 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 3/19/13. "Defendants Tina Agaran and Abby Medrano's Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. Defendant Eric Stevenson is DISM ISSED without prejudice. The Clerk is instructed to enter judgment and close the file." (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Dion'e Kaeo-Tomaselli served by first class mail at the address of record on March 19, 2013.
November 8, 2011 6 Featured Case ORDER Dismissing Complaint With Leave To Amend re 1 . Signed by JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 11/7/11. (gls, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document el ectronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry. 3 copies of Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint w/instructions was served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry to the plaintiff.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Kaeo-Tomaselli v. Women's Community Correctional Center et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dione Kaeo-Tomaselli
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Women's Community Correctional Center
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abby Medrano
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Public Safety, State of Hawaii
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tina Doe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Doe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health Care Unit
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]