Kowalski v. Hawaii International Seafood, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: William R. Kowalski and Hawaii International Seafood, Inc.
Defendant: Anova Food, LLC, Clearsmoke Technologies, LTD, Does 1-10 and Anova Food, Inc.
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv00795
Filed: December 29, 2011
 
Court: Hawaii District Court
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Honolulu
Referring Judge: UNASSIGNED
Presiding Judge: RICHARD L. PUGLISI
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 10, 2012 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT CLEARSMOKE TECHNOLOGIES, LTD.'S MOTION TO VACATE ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND QUASH SERVICE AND DENYING ITS MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION (DOC. 29 ). Signed by JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR o n 08/10/2012. (eps) -- Plaintiffs' service is ordered QUASHED. The March 23, 2012 Entry of Default against Clearsmoke is VACATED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive el ectronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
August 10, 2012 105 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR ORDER ALLOWING SERVICE UPON CLEARSMOKE TECHNOLOGIES, LTD.'S U.S. COUNSEL 41 . Signed by JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI on 08/10/2012. (eps) -- Plaintiffs have not presen ted any facts to suggest that they are unable to locate Clearsmoke in Malta or that they have attempted service in accordance with the Hague Service Convention. Under these circumstances, the Court declines to exercise its discretion to authorize alt ernative service on Clearsmoke's U.S. counsel CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
July 31, 2013 216 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT ANOVA FOOD, LLC's MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION (ECF No. 112 ) AND DENYING DEFENDANT CLEARSMOKE TECHNOLOGIES, LTD.'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION (ECF No. 113 ) AND DENYING DEFENDANT ANOVA FOOD, INC.'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION (ECF No. 115 ) AND DENYING DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR AN INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. § 1292(b). Signed by JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR on 7/31/2013. (ecs, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
March 31, 2014 311 Opinion or Order of the Court Claim Construction ORDER. Signed by JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR on 3/31/2014. (gab, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
May 14, 2014 334 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Finding Defendants Anova Food, Inc. and Anova Food, LLC Are Not Precluded From Asserting A Patent Invalidity Defense. Signed by JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR on 5/14/14. (gab, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registe red to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Kowalski v. Hawaii International Seafood, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William R. Kowalski
Represented By: Milton M. Yasunaga
Represented By: Allison Mizuo Lee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hawaii International Seafood, Inc.
Represented By: Allison Mizuo Lee
Represented By: Milton M. Yasunaga
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anova Food, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clearsmoke Technologies, LTD
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anova Food, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]