Hillen v. Liilii et al

Plaintiff: Barbie-Jane Hillen
Defendant: Jeff Liilii and B. Miller
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00222
Filed: April 25, 2012
 
Court: Hawaii District Court
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Honolulu
Referring Judge: KEVIN S.C. CHANG
Presiding Judge: SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 16, 2012 10 Featured Case ORDER DISMISSING FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND ACTION re 9 - Signed b CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 7/16/12. -- "IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: (1) The Complaint is DISMISSED for failure to state a claim. See 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e )(2)(b) & 1915A(b)(1). Because amendment is futile, this dismissal is with prejudice, and leave to amend is not granted. (2) This dismissal may be counted as strike pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). (3) The court certifies that any appeal of this order would be frivolous and, therefore, not taken in good faith, given Ms. Hillen's failure to state a claim on which relief can be granted and her failure to adequately amend the complaint. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 445 (19 62); 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3); Fed. R. App. P. 24(a)(3)(A). (4) The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to enter judgment and to close this case." (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Barbie-Jane Hillen served by first class mail at the address of record on July 16, 2012.
April 27, 2012 4 Featured Case ORDER DENYING IN FORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION re 3 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 4/27/12. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Barbie-Jean Hillen served a copy of this order and an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by a Prisoner (with instructions) by first class mail at the address of record on April 27, 2012.
June 13, 2012 8 Featured Case ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE GRANTED TO AMEND re 1 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 6/12/12. -- "(2) Hillen is GRANTED leave to file a proposed amended complaint curing the deficiencies noted above by July 9, 2012. Failure to timely amend the Complaint and cure its pleading deficiencies will result in AUTOMATIC DISMISSAL of this action for failure to state a claim, and may be counted as strike pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). (3) The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a form prisoner civil rights complaint to Plaintiff so that she may comply with the directions in this Order." (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electroni c notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Barbie-Jane Hillen served by first class mail at the address of record on June 13, 2012. -- A Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint form with instructions was included in the mailing to Ms. Hillen.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Hillen v. Liilii et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbie-Jane Hillen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Liilii
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Miller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]