Skyline Zipline Global, LLC v. Domeck et al

Plaintiff: Skyline Zipline Global, LLC
Defendant: Todd Domeck, Experiential Resources, Inc., Go Zip, LLC, Maui Land And Pineapple Company, Inc., Kapalua Land Company, Ltd., Piiholo Ranch, LLC, Piiholo Classic, LLC, John Does 1-10, Jane Does 1-10, Doe Corporations 1-10 and Doe Partnerships 1-10
Case Number: 1:2012cv00450
Filed: August 8, 2012
Court: Hawaii District Court
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Honolulu
Referring Judge: BARRY M. KURREN
Presiding Judge: J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 6, 2013 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) Granting Defendants/Counterclaimants Todd Domeck, Experimental Resources, Inc., And Go Zip, LLC's Motion For Summary Judgment As To Count 1 (Patent Infringement) Of The Complaint Filed on August 8, 2012, Doc. No. 47; And (2) Granting D efendant Maui Land And Pineapple Company, Inc.'s And Kapalua Land Company, LTD.'s Motion For Summary Judgment As To Count I Of The Complaint, Doc. No. 56 re 47 , 56 . Signed by JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 2/6/13. (gls, ) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
February 21, 2013 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) Granting In Part And Denying In Part Maui Land And Pineapple Company, Ltd's Motion To Dismiss, Doc. No. 21; And (2) Granting Baldwin Brothers, LLC DBA Piiholo Ranch Zipline's Partial Substantive Joinder In Maui Land And Pineapple Company, Ltd.'s Motion To Dismiss Doc. No. 31 in re 21 , 31 . Signed by JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 2/21/13. (gls, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
March 15, 2013 90 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER (1) GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MAUI LAND AND PINEAPPLE COMPANY, LTD.'S MOTION TO DISMISS, DOC. NO. 21; AND (2) GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART BALDWIN BROTHERS, LLC DBA PIIHOLO RANCH ZIPLINE'S PARTIAL SUBSTA NTIVE JOINDER IN MAUI LAND AND PINEAPPLE COMPANY, LTD.'S MOTION TO DISMISS, DOC. NO. 31 re 21 ; 31 ; 78 ; 89 - Signed by JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 3/15/13. footnote 3 (page 2) " On March 13, 2013, Plaintiffs file d a Rule 60(a) Motion seeking to correct the court's February 21, 2013 Order. The court GRANTS the Rule 60 Motion -- this Amended Order corrects a clerical mistake in the court's February 21, 2013 Order, which inadvertently stated th at it was granting Baldwin Brothers Partial Substantive Joinder." (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Skyline Zipline Global, LLC v. Domeck et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Skyline Zipline Global, LLC
Represented By: James H. Fosbinder
Represented By: Rhonda M. Fosbinder
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Domeck
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experiential Resources, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Go Zip, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maui Land And Pineapple Company, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kapalua Land Company, Ltd.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Piiholo Ranch, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Piiholo Classic, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-10
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporations 1-10
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Partnerships 1-10
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]