Lima et al v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company et al

Defendant: David B. Rosen, Doe Defendants 1-50, The Law Office of David B. Rosen and Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Plaintiff: Lionel Lima, Jr., Barbara-Ann Delizo-Lima and Calvin Jon Kirby, III
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00509
Filed: September 10, 2012
 
Court: Hawaii District Court
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Honolulu
Presiding Judge: SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY
Referring Judge: RICHARD L. PUGLISI
 
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 30, 2013 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER MODIFYING THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S FINDINGS AND ADOPTING RECOMMENDATION THAT MOTIONS FOR RULE 11 SANCTIONS BE DENIED re 96 , 97 , 108 , 109 , 110 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 10/30/13. "The port ions of the F & R objected to have been reviewed and modified. The court here adopts the Magistrate Judge's recommendation that the Rosen Defendants' motions for Rule 11 sanctions be denied." (emt, )CERT IFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
March 29, 2013 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION TO DENY PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR AN ORDER OF REMAND for 57 , 56 . Signed by JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 03/29/2013. (eps) -- The court adopts the F&Rs except with regard to the "similar class actions" issue and the "fraudulent joinder" issue. The F&Rs may well be correct with respect to those issues, but they are unnecessary to the present ruling. Plaintiffs' motions to rem and are denied on the other bases set forth in the F&Rs. The Clerk of Court is directed to docket this Order in both the Lima (CIV NO 12-00509 SOM-RLP) and Gibo (CIV 12-00514 SOM-RLP) cases CERTIFICATE OF SERVIC EParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
April 30, 2013 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS 19 , 30 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 4/30/13. " The court grants the motions. This disposes of all claims in the Gibo and Lima cases. Howe ver, given Plaintiffs' references to possible Second Amended Complaints, the court will not enter judgment immediately. If Plaintiffs wish to file a Second Amended Complaint, Plaintiffs must seek leave by filing a motion directed to the Magistr ate Judge on or before May 21, 2013. Any such motion shall include as an attachment a copy of the proposed Second Amended Complaint. This court expresses no opinion as to whether any such motion should or should not be granted. If Plaintiffs f ail to seek leave on or before May 21, 2013, the Clerk of Court shall enter judgment for the Banks and Rosen and close these cases on May 22, 2013. " (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registe red to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
May 6, 2013 77 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS 19 , 30 , 74 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 4/30/13. "The court grants the motions. This disposes of all claims in the Gibo and Lima cases. However, given Plaintiffs' references to possible Second Amended Complaints, the court will not enter judgment immediately. If Plaintiffs wish to file a Second Amended Complaint, Plaintiffs must seek leave by filing a motion directed to the Magistrate Judge on or before May 21, 2013. Any such motion shall include as an attachment a copy of the proposed Second Amended Complaint. This court expresses no opinion as to whether any such motion should or should not be granted. I f Plaintiffs fail to seek leave on or before May 21, 2013, the Clerk of Court shall enter judgment for the Banks and Rosen and close these cases on May 22, 2013. " (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParti cipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Lima et al v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David B. Rosen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Defendants 1-50
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Law Office of David B. Rosen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Represented By: Andrew V. Beaman
Represented By: Bernard J. Garbutt, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lionel Lima, Jr.
Represented By: Van-Alan H. Shima
Represented By: Stanley H Roehrig
Represented By: Raymond C. Cho
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara-Ann Delizo-Lima
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Raymond C. Cho
Represented By: Stanley H Roehrig
Represented By: Van-Alan H. Shima
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calvin Jon Kirby, III
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Raymond C. Cho
Represented By: Stanley H Roehrig
Represented By: Van-Alan H. Shima
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]