Billete et al v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company et al

Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Deutsche Bank National Trust Company and Does 1-50
Plaintiff: Joseph Billete and Marivel Billete
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00061
Filed: February 5, 2013
 
Court: Hawaii District Court
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Honolulu
Referring Judge: KEVIN S.C. CHANG
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI
 
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444 Petition for Removal- Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 29, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT FILED JANUARY 16, 2013 re: 5 . Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 5/28/2013. ~ Order grants plaintiffs leave to file a First Amended Complaint; plaintiffs must file their First Amended Complaint by no later than July 1, 2013 ~ [Order follows hearing held on May 13, 2013. Minutes of hearing: doc no. 14 ] (afc) CERTIFICATE OF SER VICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
July 26, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO RECONSIDER JULY 2, 2013 ORDER DISMISSING CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE AND FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT re: 17 21 . ~ Excerpt of Conclusion: "Plaintiffs shall file their First Amended Complaint by July 31, 2013. The Court CAUTIONS Plaintiffs that the failure to file their First Amended Complaint by July 31, 2013 will result in the automatic dismissal with prejudi ce of the claims that the 5/29/13 Order dismissed without prejudice." ~ Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 7/26/2013. [Written order follows the Court's 7/24/2013 Minute Order (doc no. 21 ) granting Motion for Reconside ration. Related: May 29, 2013 Order: doc no. 15 ] (afc)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail add ress listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). All participants are registered to receive electronic notifications. DOCKET TEXT MODIFIED on 7/26/2013 to correct document number link to correlate to the Motion for Reconsideration. Motion for Reconsideration is doc. no. 17 . NEF REGENERATED. (afc).
October 30, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED JULY 31, 2013 re: 24 .. Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 10/30/2013. ~ Order grants plaintiffs leave to file a Second Amended Complaint "consistent with the terms of this Order." Plaintiffs must file their Second Amended Complaint by no later than November 18, 2013. Written order follows oral order of 10/15/2013 (minutes of hearing : doc. no. 31 ) ~ (afc) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Billete et al v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Represented By: Sofia Hirosane McGuire
Represented By: Charles R. Prather
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-50
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Billete
Represented By: Ericka S. Hunter
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin
Represented By: Frederick J. Arensmeyer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marivel Billete
Represented By: Ericka S. Hunter
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin
Represented By: Frederick J. Arensmeyer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]