Wideman v. Abercrombie et al

Defendant: David Fujishiro, Phyllis Hironaka, Michael Town, Joyce Hoshijo, Kevin Rego, Bert Masuoka, Neil Abercrombie, Ted Sakai, Tommy Johnson and Charles Sizemore
Plaintiff: Lonnell Reginald Wideman
Case Number: 1:2013cv00081
Filed: February 19, 2013
Court: Hawaii District Court
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Honolulu
Referring Judge: BARRY M. KURREN
Presiding Judge: SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 27, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING IN FORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION re 3 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 2/26/13. "On or before MARCH 26, 2013, Plaintiff must pay the filing fee of $350.00, or submit a fully completed in forma pauperis application on the court's approved prisoner form, including a certified six-month trust account statement showing that he is a pauper within the meaning of the statute. Failure to do so will result in AUTOMATIC DISMISSAL of the Com plaint and action without prejudice for failure to prosecute this action or to follow a court order." "The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to send Plaintiff a copy of the court's prisoner in forma pauperis application so that he may co mply with this Order." (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electro nic Filing (NEF). Lonnell Reginald Wideman served by first class mail at the address of record on February 27, 2013. A copy of the court's Application to Proceed in forma pauperis by a Prisoner and instructions were included in the mailing to Mr. Wideman.
March 6, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. §§ 1915A& 1915 re 1 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 3/5/13. " 1. The Complaint is DISMISSED in its entirety for failure to state a claim pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §§ 1915(e)(2) and 1915A(a). 2. Plaintiff is granted leave to file an amended complaint on or before April 2, 2013, in compliance with this Order. If Plaintiff fails to do so, this action shall be AUTOMATICALLY DISMISSED, without further notice and the Clerk SHALL enter judgment stating that the dismissal was made pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915. 3. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to forward a copy of the court's prisoner civil rights complaint and instructions to Pl aintiff so that he may comply with this Order." (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Lonnell Reginald Wideman served by first class mail at the address of record on March 6, 2013. A copy of the court's Prisoner Civil Rights Form and instructions were included in the mailing to Mr. Wideman.
April 15, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court DISMISSAL ORDER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 4/15/13. "Pursuant to Rule 41(b), this action is DISMISSED with prejudice. The Clerk of Court should note that this dismissal may constitute a strike pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g)." (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Lonnell Reginald Wideman served by first class mail at the address of record on April 15, 2013.
May 14, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING RECONSIDERATION AND VACATING JUDGMENT re 8 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 5/13/13. " Plaintiff is ORDERED to submit: (1) the full civil filing fee of $400; or (2) a fully completed IFP applic ation showing that he is a pauper within the meaning of 28 U.S.C. § 1915. Regardless of whether Plaintiff selects (1) or (2), Plaintiff is ORDERED to also submit (3) an amended complaint curing the deficiencies noted in the Order Dismissing C omplaint filed on March 6, 2013. Either (1) or (2), as well as (3) must be submitted on or before June 3, 2013. Failure to satisfy this Order will result in dismissal of this action without prejudice. The Clerk SHALL send Plaintiff copies of the o riginal Complaint, ECF No. 1; the Order Denying In Forma Pauperis, ECF No. 4; the Order Dismissing Complaint, ECF No. 5; and the court's in forma pauperis application and prisoner civil rights complaint form, so that Plaintiff can comply with this Order." (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Lonnell Reginald Wideman served by first class mail at the address of record on May 14, 2013. Pursuant to this order, the following documents were included in the mailing to Mr. Wideman: 1)ECF No. 1 a copy of the original complaint; 2 ) ECF No 4 the Order Denying In Forma Pauperis; 3) ECF No. 5 the Order Dismissing Complaint; 4) the court's "Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by a Prisoner and its instructions and 5) the court's "Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint" form and its instructions.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wideman v. Abercrombie et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Fujishiro
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phyllis Hironaka
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Town
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joyce Hoshijo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Rego
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bert Masuoka
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neil Abercrombie
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ted Sakai
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tommy Johnson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Sizemore
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lonnell Reginald Wideman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]