Dimitrion et al v. Morgan Stanley Home Loans et al

Defendant: Saxon Mortgage Services, Inc., PHH Mortgage Corporation and Morgan Stanley Home Loans
Plaintiff: Michael J. Dimitrion and Tina Marie Dimitrion
Case Number: 1:2013cv00125
Filed: March 14, 2013
Court: Hawaii District Court
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Honolulu
Referring Judge: BARRY M. KURREN
Presiding Judge: J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal - Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 29, 2014 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION. Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 5/29/2014. ~ The Court hereby dismisses the Dimitrions' complaint for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. The Clerk of C ourt is directed to close the case. (ecs, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
September 16, 2014 74 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION TO GRANT IN PART AND DENY IN PART DEFENDANTS' 61 MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS. Signed by Judge BARRY M. KURREN on 9/14/2014. ~ the Court finds and recommends that Defendants Motion f or Attorneys Fees and Costs (Doc. 61) be GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. The Court recommends that Defendants be awarded $5,543.76 in fees and $1,021.23 in costs (ecs, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEPa rticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
October 6, 2014 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION 74 . Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 10/6/2014. ~ "Findings and Recommendation to Grant in Part and Deny in Part Defendant's Motion for Attorneys 9; Fees and Costs" are adopted as the opinion and order of this Court. (ecs, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dimitrion et al v. Morgan Stanley Home Loans et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saxon Mortgage Services, Inc.
Represented By: Nicole Denise Stucki
Represented By: Alika L. Piper
Represented By: Simon Klevansky
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Alika L. Piper
Represented By: Simon Klevansky
Represented By: Nicole Denise Stucki
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Stanley Home Loans
Represented By: Nicole Denise Stucki
Represented By: Alika L. Piper
Represented By: Simon Klevansky
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael J. Dimitrion
Represented By: Sandra D. Lynch
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Marie Dimitrion
Represented By: Sandra D. Lynch
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]