Bald et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al

Plaintiff: Emily Lelis and David Emory Bald
Defendant: The Law Office of David B. Rosen, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., David B. Rosen and Doe Defendants 1-50
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00135
Filed: March 20, 2013
 
Court: Hawaii District Court
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Honolulu
Referring Judge: KEVIN S.C. CHANG
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI
 
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1444 Petition for Removal- Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 5, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.'S EX PARTE MOTION UNDER L.R. 40.2 TO ASSIGN SIMILAR CASE TO A SINGLE DISTRICT COURT JUDGE re: 18 . Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 6/5/2013. Excerpt of Conclusion: ~ "The Court DIRECTS the Clerk's Office to reassign this case, including all pending motions in the instant case, to Chief United States District Judge Susan Oki Mollway and United States Magistrate Judge Richard L. Pugl isi." ~ Case reassigned to CHIEF U.S. DISTRICT JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY and U.S. JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI; Please reflect new case number CV 13-00135-SOM-RLP on all further pleadings. Motions referred to Chief Judge Susan Oki Mollway: (1) 5 Defendants The Law Office of David B. Rosen, a Law Corporation, and David B. Rosen's MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for failure to State a Claim, and (2) 8 Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint. (afc) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
July 25, 2013 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS re 8 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 7/25/13. "The court grants Wells Fargo's Motion to Dismiss. TheClerk is directed to enter judgment for Wells Fargo and to clo se this case." see footnote 2 on page 2 regarding 5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by David Rosen -- " 2 Plaintiffs initially also sued David Rosen in both his professional and personal capacity. See ECF No. [ 1]. On March 21, 2013, Rosen filed a Motion to Dismiss. ECF No. 5 . On July 1, 2013, before this court had heard argument on Rosen's Motion to Dismiss, Plaintiffs dismissed Rosen from this lawsuit. ECF No. 40 . Given Rosen's dismi ssal from this case, the court denies Rosen's Motion to Dismiss as moot." (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
December 10, 2013 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S FINDINGS AND ADOPTING RECOMMENDATION THAT MOTION FOR RULE 11 SANCTIONS BE DENIED re 63 , 64 - - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 12/10/13. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Bald et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Lelis
Represented By: Van-Alan H. Shima
Represented By: John F. Perkin
Represented By: Brandee J. Faria
Represented By: Raymond C. Cho
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Emory Bald
Represented By: Van-Alan H. Shima
Represented By: John F. Perkin
Represented By: Brandee J. Faria
Represented By: Raymond C. Cho
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Law Office of David B. Rosen
Represented By: Lauren M Akitake
Represented By: David B. Rosen
Represented By: Anna T. Valiente
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Clyde J. Wadsworth
Represented By: James B. Rogers
Represented By: Paul Alston
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David B. Rosen
Represented By: David B. Rosen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Defendants 1-50
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]