Baker v. State of Hawai'i et al.

Defendant: Jane Does 1-100, John Does 1-100, Robert Korbel Davis, Jr., Hugh E. Gordon, Scott D. Parker, State of Hawai'i, Neil Abercrombie and Hawaiian Homelands, Department of, State of Hawaii
Plaintiff: Haunani Y. Baker and Frederick H.K. Baker, Jr.
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00159
Filed: April 4, 2013
 
Court: Hawaii District Court
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Honolulu
Referring Judge: KEVIN S.C. CHANG
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI
 
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 29:1109
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 24, 2013 37 Featured Case ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION re: 23 . Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 7/24/2013. [Written order follows the Court's minute order issued July 19, 2013 as docket entry no. 36 ] (afc) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
October 7, 2013 66 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING STATE DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND FILED JUNE 12, 2013 27 AND GRANTING DEFENDANT ROBERT KORBEL DAVIS JR.'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AME NDED CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND FILED JUNE 12, 2013 44 . Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 10/4/2013. [Order follows hearing held 10/2/2013. Minutes: 63 ] (afc)CERTIFICATE OF SE RVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
December 13, 2013 83 Featured Case ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF THIS COURT'S ORDER GRANTING STATE DEFENDANTS' AND DEFENDANT ROBERT KORBEL DAVIS JR.'S MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 12/13/2013. ~ This Court reminds Plaintiffs that they must serve Defendants Hugh E. Gordon and Scott D. Parker with the First Amended Complaint by December 20, 2013. [Dkt. no. 69.] This Court CAUTIONS Plaintiffs that, if they fail to serve Defendants Gordon and Parker with the First Amended Complaint by December 20, 2013, this Court will dismiss Plaintiffs' claims against Defendants Gordon and Parker without prejudice. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). ~ Re: 71 MOTION for Reconsideration re 66 O rder on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (ecs, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
February 11, 2014 96 Featured Case ORDER DISMISSING CLAIMS WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 02/11/2014. (eps)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Baker v. State of Hawai'i et al.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-100
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-100
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Korbel Davis, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hugh E. Gordon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott D. Parker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Hawai'i
Represented By: Matthew Sadayoshi Dvonch
Represented By: Diane K. Taira
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neil Abercrombie
Represented By: Matthew Sadayoshi Dvonch
Represented By: Diane K. Taira
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hawaiian Homelands, Department of, State of Hawaii
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Haunani Y. Baker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick H.K. Baker, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]