Butler v. County of Maui

Defendant: County of Maui
Plaintiff: Kurt Butler
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00163
Filed: May 3, 2013
 
Court: Hawaii District Court
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Maui
Referring Judge: KEVIN S.C. CHANG
Presiding Judge: SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
August 29, 2013 35 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING COUNTY OF MAUI'S MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT re 16 , 34 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 8/29/13. "The motion to dismiss is granted. Res judicata applies to bar Butler's S econd Amended Complaint in this court because Butler brought a prior state-court suit that involved the same parties and identical claims, and that terminated in a final judgment on the merits. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment in f avor of the County of Maui and to close this case." (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Kurt Butler served by first class mail at the address of record on August 29, 2013.
May 8, 2013 5 Featured Case ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT; ORDER DENYING AS MOOT APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS re 1 , 3 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 5/8/13. "Because the court dismisses the Complaint, the Application is denied as moot. Butler is given leave to file an Amended Complaint no later than June 7, 2013." " If Butler files an Amended Complaint, he must either pay the applicable filing fee or file another application to proceed in forma pauperis. This action will automatically be dismissed if Butler fails to timely 1) file an Amended Complaint and 2) submit the appropriate filing fee or a new application to proceed in forma pauperis." (Motion terminated: 3 APPLICATION t o Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Kurt Butler.) (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronicall y at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Kurt Butler shall be served by first class mail at the address of record on May 9, 2013. A copy of the court's application to proceed in forma pauperis shall be included in the mailing to Mr. Butler.
May 24, 2013 9 Featured Case ORDER DISMISSING FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; ORDER DENYING AS MOOT APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS re 6 , 8 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 5/24/13. "The court grants Butler leave to file a Second Amende d Complaint that cures the deficiencies noted in this order and in the court's earlier order. Any such Second Amended Complaint must be filed no later than June 14, 2013." "If Butler files a Second Amended Complaint, hemust either pa y the applicable filing fee or file another application to proceed in forma pauperis. This action will automatically be dismissed if Butler fails to timely 1) file a Second Amended Complaint and 2) submit the appropriate filing fee or a new applicati on to proceed in forma pauperis." (Motion terminated: 8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Kurt Butler.) (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registe red to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Kurt Butler served by first class mail at the address of record on May 24, 2013. A copy of the court's application to proceed in forma pauperis shall be included in the mailing to Mr. Butler.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Butler v. County of Maui
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Maui
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kurt Butler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]