Barker et al v. Gottlieb et al

Defendant: Charles Hall, Donald Borneman, Jonathan Dubowsky, Joshua L. Gottlieb, Scott Harris, Value Change Advisors, The, Gemco-Pacific Energy LLC and Roes 1-25
Plaintiff: Does 1-10 and Charles Barker, III
Case Number: 1:2013cv00236
Filed: May 15, 2013
Court: Hawaii District Court
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Honolulu
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI
Referring Judge: BARRY M. KURREN
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 24, 2014 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT re 94 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 10/24/2014. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint, filed July 15, 2014, is HEREBY GRANTED. There being no remaining claims in this case, the Court DIRECTS the Clerk's Office to enter judgment and close the case on November 17, 2014, unless Plaintiff files a timely motion for reconsideration of the instant Order. (eps)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
December 10, 2014 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO RECUSE re 104 MOTION for Reconsideration re 102 Order on Motion to Dismiss, filed by Charles Barker, III. Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 12/10/2014. -- th is Court has denied Plaintiff's Motion to Recuse, reassignment of Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration to another district judge is not necessary. Defendants' memorandum in opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration is due by December 19, 2014. Plaintiff's optional reply in support of the Motion for Reconsideration is due by December 31, 2014. This Court will take Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration under advisement thereafter. (eps)< FONT SIZE=1>CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
October 16, 2013 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS re: 19 . Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 10/16/2013. Excerpt of Conclusion: "The Motion is GRANTED insofar as all of the claims in Plaintiff's Complaint are HEREBY DISMISSED. The Motion is DENIED insofar as the dismissal is WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiff may file his amended complaint by no later than November 27, 2013. This Court CAUTIONS Plaintif f that, if he fails to file his amended complaint by November 27, 2013, or if his amended complaint fails to cure the defects addressed in this Order, the claims that this Order dismissed without prejudice may be dismissed with prejudice.&quo t; (afc) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
April 16, 2014 83 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION TO DENY PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PERJURY SANCTIONS, DENY PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL, AND GRANT DEFENDANTS' COUNTER MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER -- re 71 MOTION for Sanctions file d by Charles Barker, III ; 73 MOTION to Compel filed by Charles Barker, III, Defendants' 76 Counter Motion for Protective Order Staying Discovery Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 04/16/2014. (eps )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications will be served by first class mail on 04/17/2014
May 27, 2014 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 83 Findings and Recommendations to Deny Plaintiff's Motion For Perjury Sanctions, Deny Plaintiff's Motion To Compel, and Grant Defendants' Counter Motion forPro tective Order". Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 05/27/2014. (eps)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
May 28, 2014 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT 59 . Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 05/28/2014. -- This Court grants Plaintiff leave to file a third amended comp laint setting forth the claims that this Court has dismissed without prejudice, if Plaintiff can amend those claims to cure the defects identified in this Order. Plaintiff shall file his third amended complaint by no later than June 30, 2014. (eps)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barker et al v. Gottlieb et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Hall
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Borneman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Dubowsky
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua L. Gottlieb
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Harris
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Value Change Advisors, The
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gemco-Pacific Energy LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roes 1-25
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Does 1-10
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Barker, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]