Howerton v. Cargill, Inc.

Plaintiff: Denise Howerton
Defendant: Cargill, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2013cv00336
Filed: July 8, 2013
Court: Hawaii District Court
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Honolulu
Referring Judge: UNASSIGNED
Presiding Judge: BARRY M. KURREN
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1391 Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 26, 2014 121 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT; AND MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF ATTORNEYS' FEE AWARD, EXPENSE REIMBURSEMENT, AND INCENTIVE AWARDS. Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 11/26/2014. Re: 100 103 ~ 1. The Court FINDS that the requirements of Federal Rules of Civil Procedure Rule 23(e) have been satisfied and that the Settlement Agreement is fair, reasonable, and adequate. 2. Th e Court DENIES the Objections as not being supported by the applicable law of this Circuit. 3. The Court therefore GRANTS final approval of the settlement and GRANTS Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Request for Entry of Final Judgment, filed on September 12, 2014; and Plaintiffs Motion for Approval of Attorneys Fee Award, Expense Reimbursement, and Incentive Awards, filed September 12, 2014. 4. The Court CERTIFIES the Class, as described in the Class S ettlement. 5. The Court ORDERS the parties to implement the terms of the settlement. 6. The Court finally APPOINTS Halunen and Associates, Reese Richman LLP and Scott+Scott Attorneys at Law LLP as Class counsel under Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(g). 7. The Cou rt ORDERS payment of the attorneys' fees and expenses from the Settlement Fund. 8. The Court BARS the class representatives and all class members, including all members who did not opt out of the Class Settlement, from bringing any related clai ms covered by this lawsuit. 9. This Court RETAINS exclusive jurisdiction over the parties and the class members for all matters related to this litigation, including the administration and implementation of the Class Settlement. Associat ed Cases: 1:13-cv-00336-LEK-BMK, 1:14-cv-00218-LEK-BMK(ecs, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
December 2, 2014 123 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT; AND MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF ATTORNEYS' FEE AWARD, EXPENSE REIMBURSEMENT, AND INCENTIVE AWARDS re (ECF NO. [ 80] in 1:14-cv-00218-LEK-BMK, ECF NO. 121 , 100 , 103 in 1:13-cv-00336-LEK-BMK, ECF NO. 40 in 1:13-cv-00685-LEK-BMK). Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 12/02/2014. ***(Amended as to typographical error) *** Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00336-LEK-BMK, 1:13-cv-00685-LEK-BMK, 1:14-cv-00218-LEK-BMK(eps)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
December 8, 2014 128 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND AMENDED ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT; AND MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF ATTORNEYS' FEE AWARD, EXPENSE REIMBURSEMENT, AND INCENTIVE AWARDS Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 12/08/2014. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00336-LEK-BMK, 1:13-cv-00685-LEK-BMK, 1:14-cv-00218-LEK-BMK (eps )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticip ants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howerton v. Cargill, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Howerton
Represented By: Christopher M. Burke
Represented By: Lawrence W. Cohn
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P. Guglielmo
Represented By: E. Kirksey Wood, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cargill, Inc.
Represented By: Peter W. Olson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]