Ayres v. Obama et al

Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigation, Dept. Veteran's Affairs, Dept. Homeland Security, Barack Obama, Clarks, British Airways and Delta
Plaintiff: Vanessiah Ayres
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00371
Filed: July 26, 2013
 
Court: Hawaii District Court
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Honolulu
Presiding Judge: SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY
Referring Judge: RICHARD L. PUGLISI
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 4, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DENYING AS MOOT PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS. Signed by JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 10/4/13. (gls, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
October 22, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION re 17 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 10/22/13. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications rec eived this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Vanessiah Ayres shall be served by first class mail at the address of record on October 23, 2013. The mailing envelope shall be addressed "Venessiah Ayres, c/o Rebecca Ayres".
August 8, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT AND DENYING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS re 1 , 4 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 8/8/13. " The court dismisses the Complaint and denies the Application but grants Ayres leave to amended her Complaint no later than August 30, 2013. Failure to file an Amended Complaint that states viable claims by August 30, 2013, will result in the automatic dismissal of this action." (emt , )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Vanessiah Ayres shall be served by first class mail at the address of record on August 9, 2013.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Ayres v. Obama et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dept. Veteran's Affairs
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dept. Homeland Security
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barack Obama
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clarks
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: British Airways
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanessiah Ayres
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]