Frost-Tsuji Architects v. Highway Inn, Inc. et al

Defendant: Doe Corporations 1-20, Jane Does 1-20, John Does 1-20, Festival Management Corporation, J. Kadowaki, Inc., Bryce E. Uyehara, A.I.A., Incorporated, Ho'ola Mau, LLC, Highway Inn, Inc., Doe Partnerships 1-20, Doe Entities 1-20, Doe "Non-Profit" Corporations and Doe Governmental Entities 1-20
Plaintiff: Frost-Tsuji Architects
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00496
Filed: September 30, 2013
 
Court: Hawaii District Court
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Honolulu
Referring Judge: BARRY M. KURREN
Presiding Judge: SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY
 
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 10, 2014 203 Featured Case ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS AND JOINDER THEREIN re 64 , 167 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 7/10/2014. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
August 26, 2014 222 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING SUMMARY JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF ALL DEFENDANTS WITH RESPECT TO COUNT IV OF THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; ORDER DENYING PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT WITH RESPECT TO COUNT V OF THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; ORDER DENYING AS MOOT DEFENDANT J. KADOWAKI, INC.'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO STATUTORY DAMAGES AND ATTORNEYS' FEES PURSUANT TO COUNT IV AND MOTION TO CONTINUE THAT MOTION; ORDER DENYING MOTION TO FILE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT 55 , 134 , 140 , 150 , [1 52], 153 , 157 , 159 , 176 , 184 , 189 , 190 , 193 , 215 , 217 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 8/26/2014. "The court grants partial summary judgment in favor of Defendants and against Frost-Tsuji on the copyright claim asserted in Count IV of the Second Amended Complaint." "In so ruling, the court disposes of ECF Nos. 55, 176, 184, 189, 190, and 193. This court's ruling as to the copyright claim rend ers moot Kadowaki's motion seeking to restrict damages relating to that claim, as well as Frost- Tsuji's motion to continue Kadowaki's motion. This order thus also disposes of ECF Nos. 140, 150, 152, 153, 157, 159, and 215." "Given the dismissal of Count IV, it would be inappropriate to allow Frost-Tsuji to file a Third Amended Complaint reasserting the same claim. Accordingly, its motion (ECF No. 217) of August 13, 2014, which seeks leave to file a Thi rd Amended Complaint, is denied without prejudice. Any future motion to amend the complaint must take into account the rulings already entered in this case." "The court denies partial summary judgment with respect to the copyrig ht management claim asserted in Count V of the Second Amended Complaint, disposing of ECF Nos. 134 and 184." (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notific ations received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
November 20, 2013 34 Featured Case ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS re 11 , 15 , 17 , 23 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 11/20/13. "Highway Inn and the Co-Defendants' motion to dismiss Counts I, II, III, VI and VII of the First Amended Co mplaint is denied." (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Frost-Tsuji Architects v. Highway Inn, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporations 1-20
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-20
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-20
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Festival Management Corporation
Represented By: David M. Lum
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Kadowaki, Inc.
Represented By: Lyle M. Ishida
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryce E. Uyehara, A.I.A., Incorporated
Represented By: Arthur H. Kuwahara
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ho'ola Mau, LLC
Represented By: Carolyn E. Hayashi
Represented By: Seth M. Reiss
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Highway Inn, Inc.
Represented By: Carolyn E. Hayashi
Represented By: Seth M. Reiss
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Partnerships 1-20
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Entities 1-20
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe "Non-Profit" Corporations
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Governmental Entities 1-20
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frost-Tsuji Architects
Represented By: Randall K. Schmitt
Represented By: Scot P.Z. Matayoshi
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]