Unity Service Coordination, Inc. et al v. Armstrong et al

Plaintiff: Unity Service Coordination, Inc., A Referral and Information Service, LLC, S.O.A.R., Inc., Coordinated Care Services, LLC, Unbefuddled, LLC and Lloyd Brinegar Short & Associates, LLC
Defendant: Richard Armstrong and Leslie Clement
Case Number: 1:2009cv00639
Filed: December 9, 2009
Court: Idaho District Court
Office: Boise - Southern Office
County: Ada - Southern
Presiding Judge: B. Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1396 Tort Negligence
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 20, 2010 32 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by dks)
March 10, 2011 48 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 36 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 40 Motion for Summary Judgment. A hearing is set for 3/25/2011 at 10:00 am in Courtroom #3 in Boise, ID before Judge B. Lynn Winmill. Simultaneous opening briefs due by 3/18/2011; simultaneous response briefs due by 3/23/2011. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by cjm)
March 30, 2011 55 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 50 Motion to Alter Judgment. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by cjm)
April 15, 2011 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AS TO REMEDY. Defendants shall extend every effort to complete a cost study and calculate a new reimbursement rate for indirect costs in keeping with the study's results by 6/17/2011. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by cjm)
March 12, 2012 68 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 62 Motion for Attorney Fees; denying 64 Motion to Enforce Judgment. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Unity Service Coordination, Inc. et al v. Armstrong et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Unity Service Coordination, Inc.
Represented By: James M Piotrowski
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A Referral and Information Service, LLC
Represented By: James M Piotrowski
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.O.A.R., Inc.
Represented By: James M Piotrowski
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coordinated Care Services, LLC
Represented By: James M Piotrowski
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Unbefuddled, LLC
Represented By: James M Piotrowski
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lloyd Brinegar Short & Associates, LLC
Represented By: James M Piotrowski
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Armstrong
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie Clement
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]