Kayser et al v. McClary

Defendant: Pam Jane McClary
Plaintiff: Donald Kayser and Mary Kay Kayser
Case Number: 1:2010cv00119
Filed: March 2, 2010
Court: Idaho District Court
Office: Boise - Southern Office
County: Ada - Southern
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 22, 2012 158 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER RE: POST TRIAL MOTIONS granting in part and denying in part 148 Motion to Amend/Correct; granting in part and denying in part 151 Motion for an Award of Costs; granting in part and denying in part 152 Motion for Attorney Fees; denying 153 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. Signed by Judge Ronald E Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (krb)
January 15, 2011 44 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 14 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Ronald E Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by krb)
February 7, 2011 47 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER Re: Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Name Experts and Add Claim for Punitive Damages. Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Name Experts and Add Claim for Punitive Damages (Docket No. 43 ) is GRANTED. On March 1, 201 1 at 10:00 a.m., the Court will conduct a hearing on Plaintiffs' attempt to add a claim for punitive damages. Signed by Judge Ronald E Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by jm)
March 1, 2011 67 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting re 43 MOTION for Leave to Name Experts and Add Claim for Punitive Damages, filed by Mary Kay Kayser, Donald Kayser. Signed by Judge Ronald E Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by krb)
March 7, 2011 77 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 40 Motion for Discovery; denying 70 Motion to Remand to State Court; granting 72 Motion to Vacate. Signed by Judge Ronald E Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by krb)
April 19, 2011 91 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 87 Motion to Take Deposition from Scott Richardson, Maria Squire and Judy Estes; denying as this time 90 Motion to Continue. Signed by Judge Ronald E Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by krb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kayser et al v. McClary
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pam Jane McClary
Represented By: Julie Klein Fischer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Kayser
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Kay Kayser
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]