Pesky et al v. United States of America

Defendant: United States of America
Plaintiff: Alan Pesky and Wendy Pesky
 
Case Number: 1:2010cv00186
Filed: April 8, 2010
 
Court: Idaho District Court
Office: Boise - Southern Office
County: Ada - Southern
Presiding Judge: B. Lynn Winmill
 
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7422 IRS: Refund Taxes
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 8, 2013 122 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Re: Motions for Summary Judgment and Motion to Strike- The Peskys' motion to strike is DENIED; the motions of the Peskys and the United States for summary judgment on the issue of deduction of the value of the Conservation Easement are DENIED; and the Peskys' motion for summary judgment on the United States' counterclaim for fraud penalties under 26 U.S.C. § 6663 with respect to the claimed deduction for the value of theConservation Easement is GRANTED. Signed by Judge William B. Shubb. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
July 8, 2013 123 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER the United States' motion for summary judgment on the Peskys' various claims for reimbursement that do not involve the Conservation Easement is GRANTED with respect to the Schedule C business deductions and various charitab le contributions, and DENIED with respect to reimbursement for contribution of stock to the Pesky Family Foundation, mortgage interest deductions, and miscellaneous itemized expenses. Signed by Judge William B. Shubb. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
October 19, 2010 19 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by cjm)
July 26, 2011 52 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Re: Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Interrogatory Responses. Granting 36 Motion to Compel production of documents and interrogatory responses. Signed by Judge William B. Shubb. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by jm)
July 26, 2011 53 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER Re: Motion for a Determination of Conflict of Interest Issues- Defendant's motion is DENIED without prejudice to renewal. Signed by Judge William B. Shubb. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by jm)
August 29, 2011 55 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Re: Motion to Compel 36 Production of Documents and Interrogatory Responses, re: 52 Order. Signed by Judge William B. Shubb. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by jm)
January 7, 2013 84 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 79 Motion to Dismiss. The United States has twenty days from the date of this Order to file an Amended Counterclaim, if it can do so consistent with this Order. Signed by Judge William B. Shubb. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (krb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Pesky et al v. United States of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Pesky
Represented By: Justin Jones
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Pesky
Represented By: Justin Jones
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]